Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 11:28:49 (UTC).

GORDILLO, CANDICE VS GORDILLO, GINO

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 GORDILLO, CANDICE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GORDILLO, GINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, H. DON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0631

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, H. DON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GORDILLO CANDICE

Respondent

GORDILLO GINO

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

9/21/2020: Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

Notice - Rejection

8/31/2020: Notice - Rejection

Minute Order

8/4/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/21/2020: Minute Order

Declaration - Income and Expense

6/25/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

6/25/2020: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/26/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation - -Property Control -Spousal Support -Access to accounts; Addition Requests Re: Children (Communication, Non-Disparaging Remarks, Anger Management, Parenting Class Etc.

6/3/2020: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation - -Property Control -Spousal Support -Access to accounts; Addition Requests Re: Children (Communication, Non-Disparaging Remarks, Anger Management, Parenting Class Etc.

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

6/3/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

6/3/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Declaration - UCCJEA

6/3/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Income and Expense

6/3/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Summons

6/3/2020: Summons

Order - Attend Mediation

6/5/2020: Order - Attend Mediation

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

6/5/2020: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Notice - Case Assignment

6/3/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/3/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

6/3/2020: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice - Rejection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (Rejected ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation (-Property Control -Spousal Support -Access to accounts; Addition Requests Re: Children (Communication, Non-Disparaging Remarks, Anger Management, Parenting Class Etc. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less