This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 05:47:50 (UTC).

GOR MATEVOSYAN VS ZHIRAYR DANIELYAN

Case Summary

On 05/14/2018 GOR MATEVOSYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZHIRAYR DANIELYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5870

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MATEVOSYAN GOR

Defendants and Respondents

DANIELYAN ZHIRAYR

DOES 1-50

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

RENTAL INSURANCE SERVICES INC

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Defendant Attorneys

BELORYAN HAIK ESQ.

BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN ESQ.

BOYD KURT

BOZOGHLIAN RODRIGO J

BOZOGHLIAN ESQ. RODRIGO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

9/1/2020: Notice of Ruling

Complaint in Intervention

9/1/2020: Complaint in Intervention

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/9/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)

Motion for Leave to Intervene

5/4/2020: Motion for Leave to Intervene

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INTERVENOR ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S M...) OF 05/05/2020

5/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INTERVENOR ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S M...) OF 05/05/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INTERVENOR ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S M...)

5/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INTERVENOR ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S M...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING RESCHEDULING ON INTERVENOR ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

5/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING RESCHEDULING ON INTERVENOR ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

Answer

2/25/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

2/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

SUMMONS -

5/14/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/14/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • Hearing09/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Hearing09/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint in Intervention; Filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to file Proof of Service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to file Proof o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Zhirayr Danielyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gor Matevosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gor Matevosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705870    Hearing Date: September 01, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

GOR MATEVOSYAN,

Plaintiff,

vs.

ZHIRAYR DANIELYAN, et al.,

Defendant.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

.: BC705870

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: INTERVENOR ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

September 1, 2020

On May 14, 2018, plaintiff Gor Matevosyan (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Zhirayr Danielyan arising from a March 17, 2018 rear-end automobile accident.  Ace American Insurance Company (“Ace”) seeks leave to file a complaint-in-intervention because Defendant is Ace’s insured and Ace believes Defendant and Plaintiffs colluded to stage the accident.

A nonparty shall petition the court for leave to intervene by noticed motion or by ex parte application.  The petition shall include a copy of the proposed complaint in intervention or answer in intervention and set forth the grounds upon which intervention rests.  (Code Civ. Proc., § 387 (c).)  The court shall, upon timely application, permit a nonparty to intervene in the action or proceeding if a provision of law confers an unconditional right to intervene, or the person seeking intervention claims an interest relating to the property or transaction that is the subject of the action and that person is so situated that the disposition of the action may impair or impede that person’s ability to protect that interest, unless that person’s interest is adequately represented by one or more of the existing parties.  (Code Civ. Proc., § 387 (d)(1).)  The court may, upon timely application, permit a nonparty to intervene in the action or proceeding if the person has an interest in the matter in litigation, or in the success of either of the parties, or an interest against both.  (Code Civ. Proc., § 387 (d)(2).)

“The trial court has the discretion to allow intervention where the proper procedures are followed, provided: (1) the intervenor has a direct and immediate interest in the litigation, (2) the intervention will not enlarge the issues in the case, and (3) the reasons for intervention outweigh opposition by the existing parties.”  (Hinton v. Beck, 176 Cal.4th 1378, 1382-1383 (2009).) Continental Vinyl Products Corp. v. Mead Corp., 27 Cal.App.3d 543, 549 (1972).)  “An interest is consequential and thus insufficient for intervention when the action in which intervention is sought does not directly affect it although the results of the action may indirectly benefit or harm its owner.”  (Id. at 550.)

Here, Ace is Defendant’s insurer and would be directly affected by the action because it is subject to any judgment obtained against Defendant by Plaintiff.  Ace suspects that the parties colluded to stage the accident in order to recoup insurance benefits.  Ace’s interests in raising issues of fraud and collusion would not be adequately represented by either of the parties.  Thus, Ace’s Motion for Leave to Intervene is GRANTED.  Ace is ordered to filed its complaint-in-intervention within five days of the date of this Order. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 1st day of September 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. 

Judge of the Superior Court