This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/30/2020 at 03:33:40 (UTC).

GOORGEN HAROOTOONYAN VS RUIYAN WU ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 GOORGEN HAROOTOONYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUIYAN WU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9382

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Plaintiffs

HAROOTOONYAN GOORGEN

FUENTES RICARDO

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HAROOTOONYAN GOORGEN

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 TO 30 INCLUSIVE

FUENTES VILMA

WU RUIYAN

FUENTES RICARDO

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FUENTES RICARDO

FUENTES RICHARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MEGEREDCHIAN ALEX ESQ

KANANI NAVID ESQ.

MCCLAUGHERTY JAY STEPHEN

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MEGEREDCHIAN ALEX ESQ

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCLAUGHERTY JAY STEPHEN

SPRIGGS SCOTT B.

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KANANI NAVID ESQ.

MCCLAUGHERTY JAY STEPHEN

KANANI NAVID

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

SPRIGGS SCOTT B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • Hearing05/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Hearing06/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) of 04/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Ricardo Fuentes (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Goorgen Harootoonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Goorgen Harootoonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Goorgen Harootoonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Goorgen Harootoonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Goorgen Harootoonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709382    Hearing Date: October 30, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

GOORGEN HAROOTOONYAN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

RUIYAN WU, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC709382

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING CROSS-COMPLAINANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

October 30, 2019

Cross-Complainant, Ricardo Fuentes propounded form interrogatories, RFAs, and RPDs on Cross-Defendant, Ruiyan Wu on 3/11/19. To date, despite multiple attempts to meet and confer, Cross-Defendant has not served responses. Cross-Complainant therefore seeks an order compelling Cross-Defendant to provide verified responses, without objections, to the outstanding discovery, deeming the RFAs admitted, and imposing sanctions.

Cross-Complainant’s motions to compel are granted. Cross-Defendant is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories and RPDs, without objections, within ten days. CCP §§2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).

The motion to deem RFAs admitted is also granted. §2033.280(a),(b).

Sanctions are mandatory. §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c), 2033.280(c). Cross-Complainant seeks sanctions in the amount of $1180/motion. The Court reduces Counsel’s billing rate from $350/hour to $200/hour, which is more typical in the personal injury courts. The Court awards one hour to prepare each form discovery motion. No opposition was filed and therefore no reply was necessary. The Court awards the requested 1.8 hours to appear at the hearing. The Court therefore awards a total of 4.8 hours of attorney time at the rate of $200/hour, or $960 in attorneys’ fees. The Court awards three filing fees of $60 each, or $180 in costs.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Cross-Defendant and her attorney of record, jointly and severally; they are ordered to pay sanctions to Cross-Complainant, by and through counsel of record, in the total amount of $1140, within twenty days.

Cross-Complainant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.