Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 16:36:33 (UTC).

GOODEN, BONITA VS HOLMES, KEVIN LAMONT

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 GOODEN, BONITA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HOLMES, KEVIN LAMONT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0068

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOODEN BONITA

Respondent

HOLMES KEVIN LAMONT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/16/2021: Minute Order

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/21/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/21/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

1/21/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

1/21/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/21/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less