This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 14:42:18 (UTC).

GOOD LOANS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS PECH CHAUFFEURED SERVICES, LLC, A MISSOURI LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 GOOD LOANS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PECH CHAUFFEURED SERVICES, LLC, A MISSOURI LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7609

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOOD LOANS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

PECH CHAUFFEURED SERVICES LLC A MISSOURI LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ALDEWICK NADER ZAKARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

2/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

3/15/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Default Judgment

3/26/2021: Default Judgment

Summary of the Case

1/5/2021: Summary of the Case

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/5/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

1/5/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/4/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

10/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/1/2020: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: (ReEntry of Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...) of 02/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV37609    Hearing Date: February 26, 2021    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: February 26, 2021

Case Name: Good Loans, LLC v. Pech Chauffeured Services, LLC, et al.

Case No.: 20STCV37609

Matter: Default Judgment Application


Tentative Ruling: The Default Judgment Application is denied without prejudice.


The Default Judgment Application is denied without prejudice. This is because Plaintiff requests $37,042 in damages (which includes two $5,000 contractual default fees) but the Complaint requests only $27,042 in damages (without the contractual default fees). This is problematic as “[t]he relief granted to the plaintiff, if there is no answer, cannot exceed that demanded in the complaint . . . .” (Code Civ. Proc. § 580.) Further, phrases such as “in an amount not less than” do not give notice for the purposes of Code Civ. Proc. § 580. (Electronic Funds Solutions, LLC v. Murphy (2005) 134 Cal.App.4th 1161, 1173-1174.)

Thus, Plaintiff can either accept $27,042 in damages for the purposes of default judgment or else amend the Complaint’s allegations as to damages, which would be a material change opening Defendants’ defaults. (Cole v. Roebling Const. Co. (1909) 156 Cal. 443; Leo v. Dunlap (1968) 260 Cal.App.2d 24, 27-28.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOOD LOANS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M