This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:46:12 (UTC).

GOOD KNIGHT INN VS LILIANA POLANIA

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 GOOD KNIGHT INN filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against LILIANA POLANIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3508

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Appellant

GOOD KNIGHT INN

Respondent and Defendant

POLANIA LILIANA

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

ROY RAJ D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

GOOD KNIGHT INN, CORPORATION'S UNDERTAKING VIA CASH DEPOSIT IN SUPPORT OF ITS APPEAL

4/26/2018: GOOD KNIGHT INN, CORPORATION'S UNDERTAKING VIA CASH DEPOSIT IN SUPPORT OF ITS APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL

4/26/2018: NOTICE OF APPEAL

Order

12/14/2018: Order

Minute Order

12/14/2018: Minute Order

Opposition

12/3/2018: Opposition

Case Management Statement

11/29/2018: Case Management Statement

Motion for Order

11/16/2018: Motion for Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/11/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

8/24/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/7/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION OF RESPONDENT

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION OF RESPONDENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (NOTICE OF MOTIO FOR ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FROM LABOR COMMISSIONER'S AWARD FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY APPEAL AND TO TIMELY POST UNDERTAKING) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Order (Order Dismissing Defendant's Untimely Appeal and Rele); Filed by Liliana Polania (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Order NOTIC...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Opposition (to Defendant's Motion for Order Dismissing Appeal); Filed by Good Knight Inn (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Good Knight Inn (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Motion for Order (Dismissing Appeal From Labor Commissioner's Award); Filed by Liliana Polania (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Liliana Polania (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Labor Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Liliana Polania (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION OF RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • GOOD KNIGHT INN, CORPORATION'S UNDERTAKING VIA CASH DEPOSIT IN SUPPORT OF ITS APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROY RAJ D.