This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 11:11:34 (UTC).

GONZALEZ RUBIO, PAULA VS VARGAS FLORES, FRANKLIN ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 GONZALEZ RUBIO, PAULA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against VARGAS FLORES, FRANKLIN ANTONIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KIM, ESTHER P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0584

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KIM, ESTHER P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ RUBIO PAULA

Respondent

VARGAS FLORES FRANKLIN ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

ROUNDS THOMAS EMERSON IV

KENNINGER SHIRLEY ANN

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

6/11/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted, Partly Denied

6/11/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted, Partly Denied

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partly Granted, Partly Denied

6/11/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partly Granted, Partly Denied

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

6/11/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/11/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

7/2/2021: FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

Proof of Service

7/2/2021: Proof of Service

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

7/2/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/9/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

8/9/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/19/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

8/19/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 1, Kim, Esther P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 1, Kim, Esther P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 1, Kim, Esther P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Partly Granted, Partly Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Partly Granted, Partly Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNINGER SHIRLEY ANN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROUNDS THOMAS E.