This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 17:39:18 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, RIGOBERTO VS CASTRO, LIBIA ZULEMA

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 GONZALEZ, RIGOBERTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CASTRO, LIBIA ZULEMA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4281

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ RIGOBERTO

Respondent

CASTRO LIBIA ZULEMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEDINA RANDY WONG

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/20/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/19/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons - Summons

4/19/2022: Summons - Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

4/19/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDINA RANDY WONG