Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2020 at 10:29:29 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, MICHELLE ELISE VS GONZALEZ, JUAN G.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 GONZALEZ, MICHELLE ELISE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GONZALEZ, JUAN G. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4263

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ MICHELLE ELISE

Respondent

GONZALEZ JUAN G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MAKUPSON CAROLYN ANNETTE

 

Court Documents

Summons

5/15/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

5/15/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/15/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/15/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Case Assignment

5/20/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/20/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2020
  • DocketEligible for OnLine Dispute (Added to trigger Modria integration )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAKUPSON CAROLYN ANNETTE