This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2021 at 00:51:11 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, GABINO VS HERNANDEZ, UVALDINA

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 GONZALEZ, GABINO filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, UVALDINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTELLA, TIMOTHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1332

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ GABINO

Respondent

HERNANDEZ UVALDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MELLS ALEXANDRA K.

MOINI MICHAEL ZIA

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - DENIED-No temporary orders issued

12/24/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - DENIED-No temporary orders issued

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

12/24/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/24/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

12/24/2020: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

Minute Order

1/13/2021: Minute Order

Response - Elder/Dependent Abuse

1/11/2021: Response - Elder/Dependent Abuse

Proof of Service

1/5/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/2/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketResponse - Elder/Dependent Abuse; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (DENIED-No temporary orders issued ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOINI MICHAEL ZIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELLS ALEXANDRA KATHRYN