This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 14:01:38 (UTC).

GOMEZ, MAYLEEN - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 GOMEZ, MAYLEEN - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2066

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOMEZ JESUS SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ BARBARA MARIA

 

Court Documents

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

3/3/2022: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

4/14/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Minute Order

4/5/2022: Minute Order

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise - (Subsequent) - Amended

5/24/2022: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise - (Subsequent) - Amended

Minute Order

6/23/2022: Minute Order

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

6/28/2022: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds

6/28/2022: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds

Order - Deposit Funds

7/8/2022: Order - Deposit Funds

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

7/8/2022: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise - (Subsequent) (Amended ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise filed on March 3, 2022 by Jesus Gomez, Sr. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ BARBARA MARIA