Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2021 at 05:05:07 (UTC).

GOMEZ, MARIA JIMENA VS GOMEZ, PABLO

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 GOMEZ, MARIA JIMENA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GOMEZ, PABLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HORAN, JAMES E., MCCOY, LARONDA and SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1470

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HORAN, JAMES E.

MCCOY, LARONDA

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOMEZ MARIA JIMENA

Claimant

CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM PENSION

Respondent

GOMEZ PABLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARE ROBERT H.

Respondent Attorney

MOISA ALEX MEZA

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

3/4/2021: Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

3/12/2021: Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

Minute Order

9/8/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance

5/19/2020: Notice - Continuance

Notice - Case Assignment

8/12/2019: Notice - Case Assignment

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

8/12/2019: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

10/18/2019: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA

10/18/2019: Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/18/2019: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Trial Setting Conference

1/17/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Trial Setting Conference

Order - Attend Mediation

1/17/2020: Order - Attend Mediation

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Trial Setting Conference

1/17/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Trial Setting Conference

Certificate of Completion - Our Children First

2/21/2020: Certificate of Completion - Our Children First

FCS-Blue Memo (FAM FCS 001)

2/27/2020: FCS-Blue Memo (FAM FCS 001)

Notice - Continuance - -Of Trial Setting Conference

3/11/2020: Notice - Continuance - -Of Trial Setting Conference

Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM

4/9/2020: Joinder - Pleading on Joinder - Employee Benefit Plan - CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM

Notice - Rejection - - of Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference of 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Notice - Rejection - - of Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference of 04/17/2020

Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan

4/27/2020: Joinder - Notice - Appear and Respond Employee Benefit Plan

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 102 at 7339 South Painter Ave., Whittier, CA 90602; Short Cause Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 102, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOISA ALEX MEZA