This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 12:26:25 (UTC).

GOMEZ, JORGE ALBERTO VS SELLS, JULIE ANNE

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 GOMEZ, JORGE ALBERTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SELLS, JULIE ANNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMERIAN, MICHAEL R and ROBERTS, GARY D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0252

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMERIAN, MICHAEL R

ROBERTS, GARY D

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOMEZ JORGE ALBERTO

Respondent

SELLS JULIE ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STERNBERG CAROL

MEDINA RANDY W.

MEDINA RANDY WONG

Respondent Attorney

SANCHEZ JOANNA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 - Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230

6/27/2022: Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 - Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

6/27/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers - Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

6/27/2022: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers - Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Minute Order

6/27/2022: Minute Order

FCS-Mediation Memo

4/21/2022: FCS-Mediation Memo

FCS - Agreement

4/21/2022: FCS - Agreement

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

2/22/2022: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Minute Order

2/22/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/22/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/4/2021: Minute Order

Request - Trial Setting

8/10/2021: Request - Trial Setting

Notice - Trial Setting Conference

9/13/2021: Notice - Trial Setting Conference

Notice - Trial Setting Conference

9/13/2021: Notice - Trial Setting Conference

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

6/9/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

6/17/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Substitution of Attorney - New Representative, RANDY W. MEDINA, Esq.

4/21/2021: Substitution of Attorney - New Representative, RANDY W. MEDINA, Esq.

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

2/23/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/23/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • Hearing10/03/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department L at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Amerian, Michael R, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers (Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketRequest - Trial Setting; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (New Representative, RANDY W. MEDINA, Esq. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDINA RANDY WONG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROL