This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2022 at 07:06:15 (UTC).

GOMEZ-GREIGO, ADONIS ADMYER - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 GOMEZ-GREIGO, ADONIS ADMYER - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4944

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRUJILLO PAULINE

Not Classified By Court

TRUJILLO ERIC

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

 

Court Documents

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

5/19/2021: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent)

5/19/2021: Petition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

5/19/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

5/19/2021: Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

Order - Prescribing Notice

5/19/2021: Order - Prescribing Notice

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/19/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian - Person Only

5/26/2021: Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian - Person Only

Letters - Temporary

5/26/2021: Letters - Temporary

Minute Order

5/26/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Of Probate Investigation Appointment 8/3/21 at 1:00pm in room 233 -Pauline & Eric Trujillo

7/22/2021: Notice - Of Probate Investigation Appointment 8/3/21 at 1:00pm in room 233 -Pauline & Eric Trujillo

Order - Appointing Guardian

10/6/2021: Order - Appointing Guardian

Notice - Hearing

10/6/2021: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

10/6/2021: Minute Order

Letters (Initial)

10/6/2021: Letters (Initial)

Duties of Guardian

10/6/2021: Duties of Guardian

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • Hearing11/08/2022 at 10:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Guardianship Review Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Guardian; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address (Pauline Trujillo )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketConfidential Guardianship Status Report; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) filed on May 19, 2021 by Pauline Trujillo. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDuties of Guardian; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketOrder - Prescribing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint a Temporary Guardian (Subsequent); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less