Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2021 at 08:23:04 (UTC).

GOMEZ, CLEMENCIA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 GOMEZ, CLEMENCIA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2349

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ GOMEZ DAVID H

Decedents

GOMEZ CLEMENCIA

GOMEZ JUANA CLEMENCIA

Not Classified By Court

GUTIERREZ RUBEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MILLER RICHARD THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

6/3/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Letters (Initial)

6/4/2021: Letters (Initial)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

6/4/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Bond - u.s. specialty

6/4/2021: Bond - u.s. specialty

Minute Order

4/22/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/20/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement to Petition

4/14/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Petition

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

4/16/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

4/16/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

3/30/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

3/16/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Account

3/16/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Account

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

3/16/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

3/12/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • Hearing10/27/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketBond (u.s. specialty ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) filed on March 12, 2021 by David H Lopez Gomez. )

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Account ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T