Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 01:39:59 (UTC).

GOMEZ, ANA VS JACOBO, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 GOMEZ, ANA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against JACOBO, RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0071

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOMEZ ANA

Respondent

JACOBO RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BLACKNELL JOVAN L

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/25/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail - DV-120 Response

3/15/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - DV-120 Response

Response - Civil Harassment

3/15/2021: Response - Civil Harassment

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/16/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

2/16/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

2/16/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Response - Civil Harassment - CH-120

2/2/2021: Response - Civil Harassment - CH-120

Proof of Service - Personal Service on 1/26/2021 at 7:06AM

1/26/2021: Proof of Service - Personal Service on 1/26/2021 at 7:06AM

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/21/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - PARTLY GRANTED/PARTLY DENIED

1/21/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - PARTLY GRANTED/PARTLY DENIED

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/21/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Civil Harassment

1/21/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (DV-120 Response ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment (CH-120 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Personal Service on 1/26/2021 at 7:06AM ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (PARTLY GRANTED/PARTLY DENIED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACKNELL JOVAN L