This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 18:26:19 (UTC).

GOLSHAN MOKHTARIAN, ET AL. VS ALFRED DUNHILL AMERICAS, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 GOLSHAN MOKHTARIAN, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALFRED DUNHILL AMERICAS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0817

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASHIR KATRIN

ASHIR MATTHEW

Defendants

ALFRED DUNHILL AMERICAS LLC FKA ALFRED DUNHILL OF LONDON INC.

BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC FKA BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC FKA MSD CONSUMER CARE INC.

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

BAYER SAMSON II LLC AKA DR. SCHOLL'S LLC

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC.

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC FKA BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC. FKA MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC.

CHANEL INC.

CHRISTIAN DIOR INC.

CHRISTIAN DIOR PERFUMES LLC

CLINIQUE LABORATORIES LLC FKA CLINIQUE LABORATORIES INC. A SUBSIDIARY OF THE ESTE LAUDER COMPANIES INC.

COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY

COLOR TECHNIQUES INC.

COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC. DBA G&G SPECIALTY PRODUCTS CO.

DR. SCHOLL?S LLC AKA BAYER SAMSON II LLC

ESTE LAUDER INC.

INTER PARFUMS INC.

L'OREAL USA INC.

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLICK MARC IAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/21/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/20/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Golshan Mokhtarian (Plaintiff); Jaklin Yazdi (Plaintiff); Katrin Ashir (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Golshan Mokhtarian (Plaintiff); Jaklin Yazdi (Plaintiff); Katrin Ashir (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Golshan Mokhtarian (Plaintiff); Jaklin Yazdi (Plaintiff); Katrin Ashir (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Golshan Mokhtarian (Plaintiff); Jaklin Yazdi (Plaintiff); Katrin Ashir (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DR. SCHOLL'S LLC a/k/a BAYER SAMSON II LLC; is a litigant

Latest cases where CHRISTIAN DIOR PERFUMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Color Techniques Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CHRISTIAN DIOR LLC. is a litigant