This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 17:29:02 (UTC).

GOLDSTEIN IMPROVEMENT COMPANY, INC., AN ALASKA CORPORATION VS CHRISTOPHER COWART, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 GOLDSTEIN IMPROVEMENT COMPANY, INC , AN ALASKA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER COWART. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0231

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDSTEIN IMPROVEMENT COMPANY INC. AN ALASKA CORPORATION

Defendants

COWART DEBRA

COWART CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

SZKOLNIK FRED MILTON

KIM JAE HONG

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/25/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

General Denial

3/9/2020: General Denial

Complaint

2/13/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Mail

3/9/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/3/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/25/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/3/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/25/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • Hearing08/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Christopher Cowart (Defendant); Debra Cowart (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Christopher Cowart (Defendant); Debra Cowart (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Goldstein Improvement Company, Inc., an Alaska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.