This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 06:47:59 (UTC).

GOLDA FIZAGIC VS STAPLES CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 GOLDA FIZAGIC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STAPLES CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6551

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIZAGIC GOLDA

Defendants

STAPLES CENTER

ANSCHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELORYAN HAIK

Defendant Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOJNT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/11/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOJNT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/14/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/16/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/5/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • Hearing01/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by LA Arena Company, LLC Erroneously Sued As Staples Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOJNT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by LA Arena Company, LLC Erroneously Sued As Staples Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Golda Fizagic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LA Arena Company, LLC Erroneously Sued As Staples Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Golda Fizagic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Golda Fizagic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Golda Fizagic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Golda Fizagic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Golda Fizagic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Staples Center is a litigant

Latest cases where ANSCHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENKOV JEFFREY MYLES