This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 00:34:34 (UTC).

GOETSCHEL, WILLI VS GOETSCHEL, SAMIRA

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 GOETSCHEL, WILLI filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against GOETSCHEL, SAMIRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOETSCHEL WILLI

Respondent

GOETSCHEL SAMIRA

Not Classified By Court

LACEY JACKIE - District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/19/2018

DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- Nathalie E. Amir ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2018

DocketProof of Service - Mail (of Notice of Ruling ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2018

DocketProof of Service (by electronic service of Notice of Ruling ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2018

DocketProof of Service - Mail (of Notice of Ruling ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2018

DocketProof of Service (by electronic service of Notice of Ruling on 04/17/18 ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2018

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2018

DocketSubpoena (Deoposition Subpoena for Personal Appearance ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2018

DocketProof of Service (Personal ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2018

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2018

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (for Access to Minor Child ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2018

DocketNotice (of Application for Access to Minor ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2018

DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less