Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 15:08:27 (UTC).

GNS FASHION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LAVITEX, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 GNS FASHION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LAVITEX, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6580

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GNS FASHION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA GLAM

GNS FASHION INC. DBA GLAM

Defendants

LAVITEX INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LAVITEX INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON ANDREW M.

Defendant Attorney

DAVID HENRY S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/16/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

3/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

1/14/2021: Case Management Order

Answer

12/11/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/24/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by GNS Fashion, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GNS Fashion, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LaviTex, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LaviTex, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GNS Fashion, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LaviTex, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GNS Fashion, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GNS Fashion, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GNS Fashion, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GNS FASHION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA GLAM is a litigant

Latest cases where LAVITEX INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID HENRY