Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 21:53:03 (UTC).

GLORIA THOMAS-TYSON VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 GLORIA THOMAS-TYSON filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8458

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS-TYSON GLORIA

Defendants

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A CORPORATION

RASIER-CA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RASIER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LENENBERG JOSELY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMSEY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/3/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2024
  • Hearing05/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Gloria Thomas-Tyson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gloria Thomas-Tyson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gloria Thomas-Tyson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gloria Thomas-Tyson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY EDWARD