This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2022 at 06:19:04 (UTC).

GLORIA SYLVIA STEVENS VS KAISER, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 GLORIA SYLVIA STEVENS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against KAISER, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3953

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVENS GLORIA SYLVIA

Defendants

DOWNEY LAND LTD

KAISER A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUS GERALD L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/25/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/25/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/25/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2024
  • Hearing07/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gloria Sylvia Stevens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gloria Sylvia Stevens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gloria Sylvia Stevens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Downey Land Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE