This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 02:09:43 (UTC).

GLORIA SANTOS VS COSTCO STORE #1050 (LAKEWOOD, CALIFORNIA) BY AND THROUGH COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 GLORIA SANTOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COSTCO STORE 1050 LAKEWOOD, CALIFORNIA BY AND THROUGH COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1721

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTOS GLORIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CERVANTES ROBERTO

COSTCO STORE #1050 LAKEWOOD CALIFORNIA BY AND THROUGH COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

KENDAL FLORAL SUPPLY LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MELKONIAN LENA BOYADJIAN

BEHESNILIAN DANIEL V

Defendant Attorney

BEAN HEATHER M.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HALL ANN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/21/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

2/18/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/3/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/21/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/8/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/8/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Settlement

10/19/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

10/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 10/25/2021

10/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 10/25/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

6/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/19/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docketat 2:44 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Settlement) of 10/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Gloria Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kendal Floral Supply, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Kendal Floral Supply, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Kendal Floral Supply, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kendal Floral Supply, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Gloria Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Costco Store #1050 (Lakewood, California) by and through Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant); Roberto Cervantes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Gloria Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gloria Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gloria Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gloria Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gloria Santos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL ANN