This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 00:30:30 (UTC).

GLORIA IBE VS UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 GLORIA IBE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3232

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IBE GLORIA

Defendants

COE KATHLEEN

PATEL TEJASH

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IKONTE ESQ. CHIJIOKE C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/14/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/14/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/14/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/14/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/14/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/14/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • Hearing06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Chijioke C. Ikonte, Esq. (Attorney): Last Name changed from Ikonte to Ikonte, Esq. Middle Name: C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketAddress for Chijioke C. Ikonte, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gloria Ibe (Plaintiff); As to: University of Southern California (Defendant); Kathleen Coe (Defendant); Tejash Patel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gloria Ibe (Plaintiff); As to: University of Southern California (Defendant); Kathleen Coe (Defendant); Tejash Patel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less