This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 13:49:45 (UTC).

GLORIA HALL, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST SHAROL JOHNSON AND DANTE HALL, ET AL. VS OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 GLORIA HALL, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST SHAROL JOHNSON AND DANTE HALL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1953

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HALL BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST SHAROL JOHNSON AND DANTE HALL GLORIA

HALL DANTE

JOHNSON SHAROL

Defendants

BENYAMINI POUYA

MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER

NAIM DAN

OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER

VOSOGHI MD. MEHRADAD

ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC

ALKASSPOOLES SALAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WORTHY DANIELLE SWEETS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/27/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/18/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/14/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2024
  • Hearing08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Gloria Hall, by and through her Successors-In-Interest Sharol Johnson and Dante Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gloria Hall, by and through her Successors-In-Interest Sharol Johnson and Dante Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gloria Hall, by and through her Successors-In-Interest Sharol Johnson and Dante Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Gloria Hall, by and through her Successors-In-Interest Sharol Johnson and Dante Hall (Plaintiff); Sharol Johnson (Plaintiff); Dante Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gloria Hall, by and through her Successors-In-Interest Sharol Johnson and Dante Hall (Plaintiff); Sharol Johnson (Plaintiff); Dante Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gloria Hall, by and through her Successors-In-Interest Sharol Johnson and Dante Hall (Plaintiff); Sharol Johnson (Plaintiff); Dante Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gloria Hall, by and through her Successors-In-Interest Sharol Johnson and Dante Hall (Plaintiff); Sharol Johnson (Plaintiff); Dante Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant