This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2022 at 00:31:36 (UTC).

GLORIA ALLORBI VS COUNTER BRANDS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 GLORIA ALLORBI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against COUNTER BRANDS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1133

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLORBI GLORIA

Defendants

COUNTER BRANDS LLC DBA BEAUTY COUNTER

SAUZEAT GAMZE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRYANT JAMES

Defendant Attorney

AL-CHALATI-MOELLER DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/21/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

2/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

2/28/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

4/6/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint

3/18/2022: Amended Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • Hearing03/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 03/13/2023 at 09:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to 04/07/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Counter Brands, LLC (Defendant); Gamze Sauzeat (Defendant); As to: Gloria Allorbi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Counter Brands, LLC (Defendant); Gamze Sauzeat (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Name Extension: (1st)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by: Gloria Allorbi (Plaintiff); As to: Counter Brands, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/10/2021 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gloria Allorbi (Plaintiff); As to: Counter Brands, LLC (Defendant); Gamze Sauzeat (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gloria Allorbi (Plaintiff); As to: Counter Brands, LLC (Defendant); Gamze Sauzeat (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gloria Allorbi (Plaintiff); As to: Counter Brands, LLC (Defendant); Gamze Sauzeat (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Counter Brands, LLC is a litigant