This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2021 at 06:36:17 (UTC).

GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC., ET AL. VS STELLAR INFLIGHT INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STELLAR INFLIGHT INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4834

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC.

EMPHASIS VIDEO ENTERTAINMENT LIMITED

POST MODERN EDIT INC.

THE LAB AERO INC.

ENTERTAINMENT IN MOTION INC.

FAIRDEAL STUDIOS PRIVATE LIMITED

Defendants

STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP

STELLAR INFLIGHT INC.

STELLAR INFLIGHT SDN BHD

STELLAR GROUP PTY LTD.

STELLAR INFLIGHT AG

STELLAR INFLIGHT ENTERTAINMENT PTY LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEIDEN DIANA HUGHES

LEIDEN DIANA HUGHES ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HAMID WEISS

HAMID WEISS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

10/26/2021: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Reply - REPLY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STELLAR INFLIGHT SDN BHD'S REPLY ISO ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

10/15/2021: Reply - REPLY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STELLAR INFLIGHT SDN BHD'S REPLY ISO ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Reply - REPLY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STELLAR INFLIGHT ENTERTAINMENT PTY LTD'S REPLY ISO ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

10/15/2021: Reply - REPLY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STELLAR INFLIGHT ENTERTAINMENT PTY LTD'S REPLY ISO ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/21/2021

10/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/21/2021

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Objection - OBJECTION SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STELLAR INFLIGHT AGS OBJECTION TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE, IMPROPER SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS MADE WITHOUT INVITATION FOR SUPPL

7/19/2021: Objection - OBJECTION SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT STELLAR INFLIGHT AGS OBJECTION TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE, IMPROPER SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS MADE WITHOUT INVITATION FOR SUPPL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/23/2021

7/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

6/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LYNDA HARRISS

6/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LYNDA HARRISS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEE NGUYEN

6/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEE NGUYEN

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DIANA HUGHES LEIDEN

6/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DIANA HUGHES LEIDEN

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID CONNELLA

6/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID CONNELLA

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Stellar Inflight Entertainment PTY Ltd 11-09-2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Stellar Inflight SDN BHD 11-09-2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Stellar Group PTY Ltd 11-09-2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Stellar Inflight AG 11-09-2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION); Filed by Stellar Inflight AG (Defendant); Stellar Group PTY LTD. (Defendant); Stellar Inflight SDN BHD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Stellar Inflight SDN BHD 11-09-2020;) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Stellar Inflight Entertainment PTY Ltd 11-09-2020;) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docketat 3:23 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Global Eagle Entertainment Inc. (Plaintiff); Entertainment In Motion Inc. (Plaintiff); Emphasis Video Entertainment Limited (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Global Eagle Entertainment Inc. (Plaintiff); Entertainment In Motion Inc. (Plaintiff); Emphasis Video Entertainment Limited (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Global Eagle Entertainment Inc. (Plaintiff); Entertainment In Motion Inc. (Plaintiff); Emphasis Video Entertainment Limited (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Global Eagle Entertainment Inc. (Plaintiff); Entertainment In Motion Inc. (Plaintiff); Emphasis Video Entertainment Limited (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Global Eagle Entertainment Inc. (Plaintiff); Entertainment In Motion Inc. (Plaintiff); Emphasis Video Entertainment Limited (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Global Eagle Entertainment Inc. (Plaintiff); Entertainment In Motion Inc. (Plaintiff); Emphasis Video Entertainment Limited (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Global Eagle Entertainment Inc. (Plaintiff); Entertainment In Motion Inc. (Plaintiff); Emphasis Video Entertainment Limited (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Global Eagle Entertainment Inc. (Plaintiff); Entertainment In Motion Inc. (Plaintiff); Emphasis Video Entertainment Limited (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POST MODERN EDIT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where STELLAR GROUP PTY LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where GLOBAL EAGLE ENTERTAINMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPROATION is a litigant