This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 17:47:34 (UTC).

GLENN BURDETTE VS ALCOHOL & SUBSTANCE ABUSE PROGRAM, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 GLENN BURDETTE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALCOHOL SUBSTANCE ABUSE PROGRAM, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0467

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURDETTE GLENN

GLENN BURDETTE A CORPORATION

Defendants

KAG CONSULTING INC A CORPORATION

21ST CENTURY WELLNESS AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

INSPIRIO HEALTH INC A CORPORATION

OMNEITY BILLING INC A CORPORATION

GRAY KENNETH

ALCOHOL & SUBSTANCE ABUSE PROGRAM AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC A CORPORATION

GRAY BRITTANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

9/28/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Request for Dismissal

8/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST

7/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST

Judgment - JUDGMENT COURT DEFAULT JMT

7/19/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT COURT DEFAULT JMT

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES

7/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/30/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

1/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/21/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/20/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/20/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by GLENN BURDETTE, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (in Support of Amending the Judgment); Filed by GLENN BURDETTE, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Amended); Filed by GLENN BURDETTE, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GLENN BURDETTE, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by GLENN BURDETTE, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Court Default Jmt); Filed by GLENN BURDETTE, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (in Support of Default Judgment); Filed by GLENN BURDETTE, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (in Support of Attorney Fees); Filed by GLENN BURDETTE, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (in Support of Interest); Filed by GLENN BURDETTE, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GLENN BURDETTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by GLENN BURDETTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GLENN BURDETTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GLENN BURDETTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GLENN BURDETTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GLENN BURDETTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOWGLY UNLIMITED INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where OMNEITY BILLING INC A CORPORATION is a litigant