This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2021 at 05:12:37 (UTC).

GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SIDHANT DHIR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 GLENDALE PLUMBING FIRE SUPPLY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SIDHANT DHIR,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6451

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AUTOMATIC FIRE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DHIR SIDHANT

KUMAR ANIL

ROEM BUILDERS INCORPORATED

THREE ALARM FIRE PROTECTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

APANIAN MILENE

Defendant Attorney

FAROOQUI OMAIR MAQSOOD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PAGAN JOHN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Request for Dismissal

2/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

2/10/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

2/11/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

11/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/14/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

9/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

7/22/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

7/22/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/17/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ...)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

7/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

7/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF ORDER ON ATTORNEY FAROOQUIS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON HIS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANTS AUTOMATIC FIRE

7/22/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF ORDER ON ATTORNEY FAROOQUIS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON HIS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANTS AUTOMATIC FIRE

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice); Filed by GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 96; Hearing on Motion - Other (to be Relieved as Counsel) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 96; Hearing on Motion - Other (to be Relieved as Counsel) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTOMATIC FIRE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant