This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 01:45:57 (UTC).

GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS WEST COAST SANDWICHES II, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEST COAST SANDWICHES II, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1283

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

WEST COAST SANDWICHES II INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA JIMMY JOHN'S GOURMET SANDWICHES DBA JIMMY JOHN'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYRNE JOHN

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/24/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

3/24/2022: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/3/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/03/2022

1/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/03/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

1/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT /COURT JUDGMENT

2/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT /COURT JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal

2/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(A); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOHN P. BYRNE; DECLARATION OF STEVEN SAYERS

2/15/2022: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(A); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOHN P. BYRNE; DECLARATION OF STEVEN SAYERS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOHN P. BYRNE RE ORIGINAL LEASE DOCUMENTS

2/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOHN P. BYRNE RE ORIGINAL LEASE DOCUMENTS

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE LOST ORIGINAL LEASE

2/16/2022: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE LOST ORIGINAL LEASE

Case Management Statement

3/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/9/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/9/2022: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOHN P. BYRNE AND STEVE SAYERS IN SUPPORT

3/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOHN P. BYRNE AND STEVE SAYERS IN SUPPORT

Judgment

3/11/2022: Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((LOS ANGELES)); Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, David A. Rosen, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF JOHN P. BYRNE AND STEVE SAYERS IN SUPPORT); Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketApplication (APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (by Court); Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service (* AMENDED *); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference (* AMENDED *); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AKA GLENDALE GALLERIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNE JOHN