This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 02:40:49 (UTC).

GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS MORTEZA VADIPOUR

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against MORTEZA VADIPOUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0588

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

VADIPOUR MORTEZA DBA "BOBA TIME"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BYRNE JOHN

BYRNE JOHN PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

ROSHAN-ZAMIR PERRY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

12/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

11/22/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)]

11/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT; STATUS CONFEREN...)

11/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT; STATUS CONFEREN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT; STATUS CONFEREN...) OF 11/29/2021

11/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT; STATUS CONFEREN...) OF 11/29/2021

Case Management Statement

11/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

9/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER))

9/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER))

Case Management Statement

9/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER))

7/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (UNLAWFUL DETAINER))

Case Management Statement

6/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

6/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/14/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

6/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

RETURNED MAIL

5/6/2021: RETURNED MAIL

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3; Status Conference ((Unlawful Detainer)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Settlement; Status Conferen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Settlement; Status Conferen...) of 11/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference ((Unlawful Detainer)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((MORTEZA VADIPOUR)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AKA GLENDALE GALLERIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNE JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNE JOHN PATRICK