This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 14:33:36 (UTC).

GLENDA HERRERA VS JASON SCOTT MACLEOD

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 GLENDA HERRERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JASON SCOTT MACLEOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0410

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERRERA GLENDA

Defendant

MACLEOD JASON SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EISENBERG JASON G

EISENBERG GARY CARL

Defendant Attorney

FAAL ALI

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

7/27/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/27/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

9/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Glenda Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jason Scott Macleod (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jason Scott Macleod (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jason Scott Macleod (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Glenda Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Glenda Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Glenda Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISENBERG JASON G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISENBERG GARY CARL