This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 01:01:06 (UTC).

GLENDA ELIZABETH RAMOS LOPEZ VS BEVERLY HILLS PHYSICIANS ET

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 GLENDA ELIZABETH RAMOS LOPEZ filed an Other lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS PHYSICIANS ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3140

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOPEZ GLENDA ELIZABETH RAMOS

Defendants and Respondents

BEVERLY HILLS PHYSICIANS

DOES 1 THROUGH 40

MACK RICHARD E. JR. M.D.

BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL INSTITUTE

RICHARD E. MACK JR. M.D. INC. A

ANOUS MAHER M. M.D.

CAPRI GLOBAL MANAGEMENT LLC DBA BEVERLYHILLSPHYSICIANS.COM

INTERNATIONAL SURGICAL INSTITUTE [DOE 6]

HAYAVI KEVIN KAYVAN M.D.

HAYAVI MICHAEL MEHRAN M.D.

BEVERY HILLS PHYSICIANS

RICHARD E. MACK JR. M.D. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF CARLOS A. LLOREDA JR.

LLOREDA CARLOS A. JR

Defendant Attorneys

BARBAGALLO WILLIAM BRADLEY

HOFFMAN BRIAN LEE

DIAZ MANUEL J.

DIAZ MANUEL JESUS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

6/7/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

6/7/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

7/10/2018: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/11/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

7/12/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

7/27/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

7/27/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Minute Order

8/21/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

10/1/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Order - Dismissal

11/13/2018: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

12/19/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

2/21/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition

3/14/2019: Opposition

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/15/2019: Answer

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FRAUD - INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

4/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FRAUD - INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Glenda Elizabeth Ramos Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (re dismissal for failure to obtain default of defendants Beverly Hills Surgical Institute and Richard E. Mack, Jr., M.D.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: re dismis...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Answer (ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, MICHAEL MEHRANHA YA VI, M.D. AND KEVIN KEYVAN HAYA VI, M.D. TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Michael Mehran Hayavi, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Kevin Kayvan Hayavi, M.D. (Defendant); Michael Mehran Hayavi, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Glenda Elizabeth Ramos Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Richard E. Mack, Jr., M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Answer (by Capri Global Management, LLC dba Beverlyhillsphysicians.com to pltf's First Amended Complaint); Filed by Capri Global Management, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Notice (of Unavailability); Filed by Glenda Elizabeth Ramos Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Glenda Elizabeth Ramos Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Proof-Personal Service; Filed by Glenda Elizabeth Ramos Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FRAUD - INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Glenda Elizabeth Ramos Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC703140    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: 74

BC703140 LOPEZ VS BEVERLY HILLS PHYSICIANS

Defendants Capri Global Management, LLC, Kevin Keyvan Hayavi, M.D. and Michael Mehran Hayavi, M.D.’s Motion to Continue Trial and All Related Dates

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is granted.

Defendants have established that plaintiff was unavailable for deposition in a timely manner, which precluded them from completing discovery or timely filing a motion for summary judgment. No reason was provided for her unavailability. However, it did prejudice defendants. There have been no prior continuances of trial, and the parties have stipulated to the continuance.