This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2022 at 06:38:48 (UTC).

GLENDA BELYEU VS VINCENT KRASHINSKY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 GLENDA BELYEU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VINCENT KRASHINSKY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0089

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BELYEU GLENDA

GETTLEMEN MELVYN

GOOLNICK PAUL

PEPPER KENNETH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ADVANCED SECURITY CONCEPTS INC.

KRASHINSKY VINCENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PHILLIPS JOHN WINSTON

PHILLIPS PATRICK

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKER LAWRENCE

Cross Defendant Attorney

PAPUCHYAN MONA

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/27/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

10/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/11/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF GLENDA BELYEU'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

8/11/2022: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF GLENDA BELYEU'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

8/18/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF GLENDA BELYEU'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

8/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF GLENDA BELYEU'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/31/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/31/2022: Cross-Complaint

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

8/9/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY C. SCHMID IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

8/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY C. SCHMID IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/9/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

6/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)]

6/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

6/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/26/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/13/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2024
  • Hearing12/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Hearing02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; Filed by: Paul Goolnick (Cross-Defendant); As to: Advanced Security Concepts, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Vincent Krashinsky (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES; Filed by: Paul Goolnick (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketAnswer TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Vincent Krashinsky (Defendant); Advanced Security Concepts, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Kenneth Pepper (Plaintiff); Melvyn Gettlemen (Plaintiff); Paul Goolnick (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Vincent Krashinsky (Defendant); Advanced Security Concepts, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Paul Goolnick (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/09/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/26/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Trial Preference scheduled for 08/22/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Glenda Belyeu (Plaintiff); As to: Vincent Krashinsky (Defendant); Advanced Security Concepts, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Glenda Belyeu (Plaintiff); As to: Vincent Krashinsky (Defendant); Advanced Security Concepts, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Glenda Belyeu (Plaintiff); As to: Vincent Krashinsky (Defendant); Advanced Security Concepts, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED SECURITY CONCEPTS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAPUCHYAN MONA