This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2020 at 00:48:38 (UTC).

GLEN-DONALD CONDOMINIUMS, INC. VS KYLE MATHEWS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 GLEN-DONALD CONDOMINIUMS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KYLE MATHEWS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5570

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLEN-DONALD CONDOMINIUMS INC.

Defendants

LIESE WILLIAM AN INDIVIDUAL

MATHEWS KYLE AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SWEDELSON DAVID

SWEDELSON DAVID ESQ.

SWEDELSON DAVID C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL AND RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION

7/2/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL AND RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

7/27/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

7/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; AND TRIAL

12/10/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; AND TRIAL

Case Management Statement

11/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF THE COURT'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF THE COURT'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/31/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

10/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

10/1/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

10/11/2019: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/11/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

10/11/2019: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/22/2019: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Granting Dismissal and Reservation of Jurisdiction); Filed by Glen-Donald Condominiums, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling ( RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; AND TRIAL); Filed by Glen-Donald Condominiums, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Glen-Donald Condominiums, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kyle Mathews, , an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by William Liese, , an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kyle Mathews, , an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Glen-Donald Condominiums, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Glen-Donald Condominiums, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Glen-Donald Condominiums, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Glen-Donald Condominiums, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Glen-Donald Condominiums, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEDELSON DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Swedelson, David C