This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 05:33:46 (UTC).

GLEN DATZ VS KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII, LLC.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 GLEN DATZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1667

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DATZ GLEN

Defendant

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABROMSON MAK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

11/29/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2024
  • Hearing11/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • Hearing04/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GLEN DATZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GLEN DATZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GLEN DATZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GLEN DATZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABROMSON MAK ESQ.