This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:10:51 (UTC).

GLEN CASPILLO VS BIG LOTS INC

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 GLEN CASPILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIG LOTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9046

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASPILLO GLEN

Defendant

BIG LOTS INC

Not Classified By Court

NADER LAW GROUP PC

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAURO FIORE JR.

Defendant Attorney

STOUDER S. CHRISTIAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/4/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

1/4/2018: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/12/2018: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/3/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/3/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

4/3/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

3/9/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/12/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Stipulation and Order

6/19/2019: Stipulation and Order

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY TRIGILIO IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS NATIONAL READY MIXED CONCRETE CO. AND DARIO SANCHEZ?S DEPOSITION SU

8/22/2018: DECLARATION OF JEFFREY TRIGILIO IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS NATIONAL READY MIXED CONCRETE CO. AND DARIO SANCHEZ?S DEPOSITION SU

Proof of Service

6/7/2018: Proof of Service

NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THI

6/4/2018: NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THI

Proof of Service

6/4/2018: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY TRIGILIO IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE

5/31/2018: DECLARATION OF JEFFREY TRIGILIO IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE

DECLARATION OF RANA NADER [N SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PR

5/31/2018: DECLARATION OF RANA NADER [N SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PR

NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.?S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND P

5/31/2018: NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.?S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND P

NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS

5/31/2018: NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to continue trial); Filed by Glen Caspillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JEFFREY TRIGILIO IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY KEY HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS NATIONAL READY MIXED CONCRETE CO. AND DARIO SANCHEZ S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by NADER LAW GROUP, PC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by NADER LAW GROUP, PC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketNON-PARTY KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES, INC.'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by NADER LAW GROUP, PC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Big Lots, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Big Lots, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Big Lots, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Glen Caspillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Glen Caspillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9046    Hearing Date: October 25, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT’S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

On January 4, 2018, Plaintiff Glen Caspillo (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant Big Lots, Inc. (“Defendant”) for premises liability arising out of a January 6, 2016 slip and fall. On October 11, 2018, Plaintiff served Special Interrogatories (Set One) Form Interrogatories (Set Two), Requests for Production of Documents (Set One), Requests for Admissions (Set One), and Requests for Admissions on Plaintiff. (Declaration of Krystale Rosal, ¶ 2.) Defendant was granted two extensions on responses. After no responses were received, Plaintiff’s counsel sent a meet and confer letter on May 15, 2019. On May 29, 2019, Plaintiff’s counsel sent a second letter. Counsel also followed up by email on June 24, 2019 and via letter on September 23, 2019. Plaintiff received no responses or response to counsel’s meet and confer as of the date of filing of these motions. (Rosal Decl., ¶ 8.)

On October 22, 2019, three days before the hearing, Defendant filed a response to the motions. Defendant states it served responses on October 11, 2019. The motions to compel responses are denied as MOOT.

The court may award sanctions under the Discovery Act in favor of a party who files a motion to compel discovery, even where the requested discovery was provided to the moving party after the motion was filed. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1348(a).) Defendant has no excuse for taking a year to serve the responses, and there is no reason to think Defendant would have ever served responses if Plaintiff had not filed the motions. Plaintiff’s request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Defendant and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the amount of $1,740.00, to be paid within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAIGHT BROWN & BONSTEEL LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where BIG LOTS F&S INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIORE MAURO JR. LAW OFFICES OF