This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 14:51:11 (UTC).

GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS ATALLOAH AMINPOUR

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 GLASSRATNER ADVISORY CAPITAL GROUP, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ATALLOAH AMINPOUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9572

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

AMINPOUR ATALLOAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DECLERCQ WILLIAM

Defendant Attorneys

ZADEH JACOB H.

KASHFIAN RYAN D

KASHFIAN ROBERT ADAM

STELNICK STEFFANIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

7/28/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/15/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO F...)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO F...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO F...) OF 02/25/2021

2/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO F...) OF 02/25/2021

Other - - COURT ORDER FOR DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING HELD 2/25/21

3/1/2021: Other - - COURT ORDER FOR DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING HELD 2/25/21

Answer

3/4/2021: Answer

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STIKE PORTIONS OF FIRTST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/18/2021: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STIKE PORTIONS OF FIRTST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/18/2021: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/11/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE POTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/11/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE POTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/26/2021

1/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/26/2021

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

1/8/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

1/8/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Case Management Statement

1/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/17/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Case Management Statement

10/9/2020: Case Management Statement

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Atalloah Aminpour (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Atalloah Aminpour (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Atalloah Aminpour (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCourt Order for Demurrer and Motion to Strike hearing held 2/25/21; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZADEH, JACOB H

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASHFIAN ROBERT A. ESQ.