This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2023 at 19:24:54 (UTC).

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO VS LORI DEWOLFE

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN SHAPIRO filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against LORI DEWOLFE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1344

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO

Respondent

DEWOLFE LORI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

COLE JONATHAN B.

KREDA RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT...)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT...)

Case Management Statement

9/18/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Application - APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

9/21/2020: Application - APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/22/2020

7/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/22/2020

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/18/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/1/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Judgment

2/8/2021: Judgment

Judgment - CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT RULE 3.1312 STATEMENT RE [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

2/8/2021: Judgment - CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT RULE 3.1312 STATEMENT RE [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/09/2021, JUDGMENT

2/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/09/2021, JUDGMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHE...) OF 01/19/2021

1/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHE...) OF 01/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHE...)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHE...)

Notice of Ruling

1/20/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

1/20/2021: Notice of Ruling

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 02/09/2021, Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCalifornia Rule of Court Rule 3.1312 Statement re [proposed] Judgment; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner); As to: Lori DeWolfe (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Petitioner Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro against Respondent Lori DeWolfe on the Petition filed by Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro on 04/13/2020 for damages of $60,500.00, attorney fees of $15,863.50, interest of $7,558.36, and costs of $681.60 for a total of $84,603.46.; Other: Interest at the rate of 10% per annum.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner); As to: Lori DeWolfe (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order Awarding Mandatory Prejudgment Post Award Interest Before Entry of Judgment Against Respondent: Filed By: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/19/2021; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Attorney Fees: Filed By: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/19/2021; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner); As to: Lori DeWolfe (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner); As to: Lori DeWolfe (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Jonathan B. Cole (Attorney): Middle Name changed from Berres to B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro (Petitioner); As to: Lori DeWolfe (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less