This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2022 at 20:27:46 (UTC).

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO, LLP,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP VS KAYVAN NAIMI

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN SHAPIRO, LLP,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAYVAN NAIMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9426

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO LLP

NAIMI KAMRAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

NAIMI KAYVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVIN JESSE B.

GLASER PATRICIA L.

WEISS OLIVIA M.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEIPZIG SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/9/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/28/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/28/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - CROSS-COMPLAINT, WITH PREJUDICE

11/21/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - CROSS-COMPLAINT, WITH PREJUDICE

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - COMPLAINT, WITH PREJUDICE

11/22/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - COMPLAINT, WITH PREJUDICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer - Defendant Kayvan Naimi's Answer to Plaintiff Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro, LLP's Complaint: Name Extension: - Defendant Kayvan Naimi's Answer to Plaintiff Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro, LLP's Complaint ; As To Parties changed from Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Plaintiff) to Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint: As To Parties changed from Kamran Naimi (Contestant), Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Plaintiff) to Kamran Naimi (Cross-Defendant), Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Plaintiff), KAMRAN NAIMI, an individual (Cross-Defendant) to Kamran Naimi (Cross-Defendant), Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Cross-Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Cross-Complaint ; As To Parties changed from Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Plaintiff), KAMRAN NAIMI, an individual (Cross-Defendant) to Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Cross-Defendant), Kamran Naimi (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - Cross-complaint, with prejudice: Filed By: Kayvan Naimi (Cross-Complainant); Result: Entered ; Name Extension: - Cross-complaint, with prejudice ; Result Date: 11/28/2022 ; As To Parties: Kamran Naimi (Cross-Defendant), Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: Kamran Naimi (Cross-Defendant), Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - Complaint, with prejudice: Filed By: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Name Extension: - Complaint, with prejudice ; Result Date: 11/28/2022 ; As To Parties changed from Kayvan Naimi (Defendant) to Kayvan Naimi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO, LLP,a California limited liability partnership on 09/09/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP as to Kayvan Naimi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Scott J. Leipzig (Attorney): Organization Name changed from ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP to Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP; Middle Name changed from Jason to J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAddress for Scott J. Leipzig (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet: As To Parties: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO, LLP,a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff); As to: KAYVAN NAIMI (Defendant); Service Date: 09/12/2022; Service Cost: 232.09; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO, LLP,a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff); As to: KAYVAN NAIMI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard L. Fruin in Department 15 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO, LLP,a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff); As to: KAYVAN NAIMI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO, LLP,a California limited liability partnership (Plaintiff); As to: KAYVAN NAIMI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less