This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 16:55:00 (UTC).

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO LLP VS SARAH LAZOW

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN SHAPIRO LLP filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against SARAH LAZOW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3939

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO LLP

Respondent

LAZOW SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STONE CLAUDIA LINN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

11/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

11/2/2022: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/2/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/2/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/2/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING OF PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY WITH SUCH AWARD AGAINST RESPONDENT SARAH LAZOW

11/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING OF PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY WITH SUCH AWARD AGAINST RESPONDENT SARAH LAZOW

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/16/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CLAUDIA STONE AND EXHIBITS 1-7 IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, ETC.

11/16/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CLAUDIA STONE AND EXHIBITS 1-7 IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, ETC.

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CLAUDIA STONE AND EXHIBIT 8 ISO PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION

1/13/2023: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CLAUDIA STONE AND EXHIBIT 8 ISO PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION

Notice of Continuance

1/13/2023: Notice of Continuance

Declaration - DECLARATION N/A

3/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION N/A

Notice of Continuance

3/15/2023: Notice of Continuance

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDeclaration N/A; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 06/20/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Claudia Stone and Exhibit 8 ISO Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 02/16/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/19/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 02/16/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Claudia Stone and Exhibits 1-7 in Support of Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award and For Entry of Judgment, etc. Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner); As to: Sarah Lazow (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner); As to: Sarah Lazow (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner); As to: Sarah Lazow (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner); As to: Sarah Lazow (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 39 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less