This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2023 at 03:55:06 (UTC).

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO LLP VS MATTHEW DABABNEH

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN SHAPIRO LLP filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against MATTHEW DABABNEH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0419

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GLASER WEIL FINK HOWARD AVCHEN & SHAPIRO LLP

Respondent

DABABNEH MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STONE CLAUDIA LINN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

2/14/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/14/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

2/14/2023: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/14/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/14/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/14/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/21/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

2/21/2023: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLAUDIA STONE AND EXHIBITS 1-7

2/21/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLAUDIA STONE AND EXHIBITS 1-7

Notice of Continuance

5/4/2023: Notice of Continuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 12/14/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Claudia Stone and Exhibits 1-7; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner); As to: Matthew Dababneh (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner); As to: Matthew Dababneh (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner); As to: Matthew Dababneh (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP (Petitioner); As to: Matthew Dababneh (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 36 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less