This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 06:07:37 (UTC).

GLADIS CRUZ MAIRENA VS A-GAME LOGISTICS ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/23/2017 GLADIS CRUZ MAIRENA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A-GAME LOGISTICS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and PATRICIA D. NIETO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7860

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

PATRICIA D. NIETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MAIRENA GLADIS CRUZ

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KTR SOUTH BAY IV LLC

A-GAME LOGISTICS

DOES 1 TO 50

PROLOGIS L.P. DOE 1

A-GAME LOGISTICS L.P.

NICA CONTAINER FREIGHT LINE INC.

MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT LLC AKA MDM LLC

PROLOGIS L.P.

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

A-GAME LOGISTICS

PROLOGIS L.P. DOE 1

MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT LLC AKA MDM LLC

A-GAME LOGISTICS L.P.

NICA CONTAINER FREIGHT LINE INC.

PROLOGIS L.P. ROE 1

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TAILLIEU OLIVIER A. ESQ.

TAILLIEU OLIVIER ALAIN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FRESCH ELAINE K. ESQ.

BROWN JAY D

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

MILES L. KAVALLER

FRESCH ELAINE KATHERINE ESQ.

KAVALLER MILES LAWRENCE

FRIEDENTHAL DANIEL R. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

KAVALLER MILES L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/23/2017: Complaint

Unknown

3/16/2017: Unknown

Unknown

3/16/2017: Unknown

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF NICA CONTAINER FREIGHT LINE, INC. AGAINST A-GAME LOGISTICS, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AND MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, A/K/A

1/11/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF NICA CONTAINER FREIGHT LINE, INC. AGAINST A-GAME LOGISTICS, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AND MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC, A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, A/K/A

Cross-Complaint

4/2/2018: Cross-Complaint

Unknown

4/10/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

7/19/2018: Minute Order

Cross-Complaint

7/20/2018: Cross-Complaint

Unknown

8/15/2018: Unknown

Other -

8/20/2018: Other -

Notice

9/4/2018: Notice

Minute Order

10/4/2018: Minute Order

Brief

5/15/2019: Brief

Motion in Limine

5/23/2019: Motion in Limine

Minute Order

6/7/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY 2. NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/23/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY 2. NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT NICA CONTAINER FREIGHT LINE, INC. TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF A-GAME LOGISTICS

5/11/2017: ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT NICA CONTAINER FREIGHT LINE, INC. TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF A-GAME LOGISTICS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF NICA CONTAINER FREIGHT LINE, INC. FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST A-GAME LOGISTICS, L.P. AND MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC,; ETC.

11/22/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF NICA CONTAINER FREIGHT LINE, INC. FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST A-GAME LOGISTICS, L.P. AND MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC,; ETC.

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Continue The Trial Date) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue The Trial Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (To Continue The Trial Date); Filed by A-Game Logistics, L.P. (Legacy Party); MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Motion in Limine (No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Insurance); Filed by A-Game Logistics, L.P. (Legacy Party); MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Motion in Limine (TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO EVIDENCE OR ANY INFORMATION PROPERLY REQUESTED BUT NOT PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY); Filed by A-Game Logistics, L.P. (Legacy Party); MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Motion in Limine (Motion In Limine 3 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY CONCERNING SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES); Filed by A-Game Logistics, L.P. (Legacy Party); MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Motion in Limine (to Precluding lay witness opinion and testimony regarding gate design and safety); Filed by A-Game Logistics, L.P. (Legacy Party); MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Declaration (OF LARA M. KRUSKA); Filed by A-Game Logistics, L.P. (Legacy Party); MENDEZ DE MAGLIANE MANAGEMENT, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Mandatory Settlement Conference)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Brief (DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT, PROLOGIS, L.P.?S MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT); Filed by L.P. PROLOGIS (Cross-Complainant); PROLOGIS, L.P. (DOE 1) (Defendant); PROLOGIS, L.P. (ROE 1) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
138 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by GLADIS CRUZ MAIRENA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GLADIS CRUZ MAIRENA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY 2. NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M-D-M is a litigant

Latest cases where PROLOGIS, L.P. is a litigant