This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 08:22:11 (UTC).

G.K. CHEN TRUST DATED OCTOBER 15, 1997

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 G K CHEN TRUST DATED OCTOBER 15, 1997 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6589

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CHEN ALEXANDER

CHEN SHING I.

Not Classified By Court

G.K. CHEN TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TRAN HUNG BAN

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Appointment of Trustee

7/2/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Appointment of Trustee

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • Hearing11/22/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Appointment of Trustee ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN HUNG BAN