Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2021 at 19:37:47 (UTC).

GIRARD, LUCIA E. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 GIRARD, LUCIA E - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUZUKI, PAUL T., LUNA, ANA MARIA and ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5033

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUZUKI, PAUL T.

LUNA, ANA MARIA

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GIRARD-SIMONE DIANA

Decedent

GIRARD LUCIA E.

Not Classified By Court

REIFMAN IRVING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SIMONE STUART RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/4/2021: Minute Order

Account - Final or Waiver - Account - Final or Waiver

11/18/2020: Account - Final or Waiver - Account - Final or Waiver

Minute Order

10/28/2020: Minute Order

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Account 2

10/14/2020: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Account 2

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Account 1

10/14/2020: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Account 1

Minute Order

9/17/2020: Minute Order

Order - Probate

10/3/2019: Order - Probate

Minute Order

9/30/2019: Minute Order

Will - Admitted

9/30/2019: Will - Admitted

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

8/28/2019: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Minute Order

8/6/2019: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

7/18/2019: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent) - Petition for Probate of Will (Subsequent)

7/5/2019: Petition - Probate of Will (Subsequent) - Petition for Probate of Will (Subsequent)

Proof of Subscribing Witness

7/5/2019: Proof of Subscribing Witness

Minute Order

7/2/2019: Minute Order

Will Deposited - 6 pgs - Dated - 02/25/2019

5/31/2019: Will Deposited - 6 pgs - Dated - 02/25/2019

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

5/30/2019: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Proof of Subscribing Witness

5/30/2019: Proof of Subscribing Witness

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Accounting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Status Report Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Subsequent) (Petition for Probate of Will (Subsequent) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Suzuki, Paul T., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketWill Deposited (6 pgs - Dated - 02/25/2019 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMONE STUART R.