Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 16:22:22 (UTC).

GIOVANNI VAZQUEZ, ET AL. VS TNH MOTORS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 GIOVANNI VAZQUEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TNH MOTORS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9371

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VAZQUEZ GIOVANNI

MAGOS ROSA

Defendants

TNH MOTORS INC.

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOPER DAVID

Defendant Attorney

MOLINO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice

6/5/2019: Notice

Notice of Settlement

7/1/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for

7/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

7/1/2019: Minute Order

Answer

4/24/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/2/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/28/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/28/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

3/19/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint

Affidavit

3/19/2019: Affidavit

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Giovanni Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • at 3:36 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of 07/01/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Giovanni Vazquez (Plaintiff); Rosa Magos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Notice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Giovanni Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Answer (TO COMPLAINT); Filed by TNH Motors, Inc. (Defendant); Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Giovanni Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Giovanni Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Giovanni Vazquez (Plaintiff); Rosa Magos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Affidavit (Affidavit of Venue); Filed by Giovanni Vazquez (Plaintiff); Rosa Magos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Giovanni Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by Giovanni Vazquez (Plaintiff); Rosa Magos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TNH MOTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOLINO ANTHONY A. ESQ.