Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 10:59:24 (UTC).

GIOVANNI MITCHELL VS THE MADERA GROUP LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 GIOVANNI MITCHELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE MADERA GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4075

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHELL GIOVANNI

Defendants

TOCA MADERA WEHO LLC

THE MADERA GROUP LLC

TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC

TOCAYA ORGANICA LLC

Not Classified By Court

DEL PRADO LAYONEL

GONZALEZ KEVIN

MENDES AMMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORSHANSKY ANTHONY JOSHUA

Defendant Attorneys

JACOBS MARK JARROD

WHEELER RYAN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CUSTIS KEITH

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/5/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ; STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

12/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ; STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

11/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Case Management Statement

10/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

9/22/2020: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/14/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/20/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/20/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/20/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/20/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/25/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/26/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/26/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 58; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Madera Group LLC (Defendant); Tocaya Organica, LLC (Defendant); Tocaya Management LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference (; Status Conference (All-Purpose)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference ; Status Conference (All-Purpose))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Giovanni Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Giovanni Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Giovanni Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Giovanni Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Giovanni Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Giovanni Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Giovanni Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOCA MADERA WEHO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TOCAYA ORGANICA LLC DBA TOCAYA ORGANICA is a litigant