Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 18:02:52 (UTC).

GINA SANCHEZ VS UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 GINA SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4892

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ GINA

Defendants

KINGDOM ANIMALIA LLC DBA HOURGLASS COSMETICS

UNILEVER UNITED STATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMES SCOTT ROBERT

KELLY ERIN MARIE

Defendant Attorney

SMITH KEVIN DEAN

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/26/2021: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. TO FILE A MOTION TO QUASH

3/26/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. TO FILE A MOTION TO QUASH

Order - Dismissal

4/19/2021: Order - Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND SUBMIT THE CASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT K

4/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND SUBMIT THE CASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT K

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ARBITRATION)

4/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ARBITRATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ARBITRATION) OF 04/20/2021

4/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ARBITRATION) OF 04/20/2021

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/8/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • Hearing10/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Arbitration) of 04/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Dismiss Defendant Unilever United States, Inc. without Prejudice and Submit the Case Between Plaintiff and Defendant Kingdom Animalia, LLC to Binding Arbitration); Filed by Gina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend Time for Unilever United States, Inc. to File a Motion to Quash); Filed by Unilever United States, Inc. (Defendant); Kingdom Animalia, LLC dba Hourglass Cosmetics (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kingdom Animalia, LLC dba Hourglass Cosmetics (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gina Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINGDOM ANIMALIA LLC DBA HOURGLASS COSMETICS is a litigant

Latest cases where UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY ERIN M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMES SCOTT ROBERT