This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 08:52:37 (UTC).

GINA ANN RAMOS VS ANDRES ISMAEL PEREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 GINA ANN RAMOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDRES ISMAEL PEREZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5523

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS GINA ANN

Defendants

PEREZ ANDRES ISMAEL

LOPEZ MARIE MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA LEMUEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/17/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/24/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gina Ann Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gina Ann Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gina Ann Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gina Ann Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA LEMUEL L.